Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
Anderson, Eugene V, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Beeler, Esq., Jeffrey S, Heineman, Esq., Michael J, against Allen, Madeline, Bard College, Bickford, Ian, Doyle, Anthony, Graves, Robert, (total of 6) See All represented by Anti, Esq., Dennis Robert, Bagley, John G, Kristan, Esq., Arielle Brooks, Lavoie, Esq., Michael, Mitropoulos, Esq., Alexandra Aurelia, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with Maureen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2019 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a wrongful death/punitive damages action filed by Eugene V. Anderson, the father and personal representative of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson's estate. The complaint is against Bard College, Anthony Doyle, Ian Bickford, and Robert Gr...
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 28, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Jeffrey S. Beeler FILED
Date: May 02, 2022Party status: Defendant Bickford, Ian: Dismissed by agreement of parties;
Date: October 11, 2022Affidavit of Attorney Gregory M. Boucher, Esq. FILED
Date: May 26, 2022Affidavit of of Joseph McCullough FILED
Date: May 26, 2022Affidavit of of Leon Botstein FILED
Date: May 02, 2022Attorney appearance On this date Michael Lavoie, Esq. added for Defendant Judith Win
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER: on Extended Tracking Order Deadlines. ENTERED Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Letter received from Attorney Jeffrey S. Beeler reporting typographical errors in the Order entered March 29, 2024. Applies To: Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff); Beeler, Esq., Jeffrey S (Attorney) on behalf of Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff) | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER: on the Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration or in the alternative to Report the Case entered (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Roberts, Esq., Scott Alan (Attorney) on behalf of Bard College (Defendant); Anti, Esq., Dennis Robert (Attorney) on behalf of Win, Judith (Defendant); Heineman, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff); Beeler, Esq., Jeffrey S (Attorney) on behalf of Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff); Kristan, Esq., Arielle Brooks (Attorney) on behalf of Bard College (Defendant); Mitropoulos, Esq., Alexandra Aurelia (Attorney) on behalf of Bard College (Defendant); Lavoie, Esq., Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Win, Judith (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 03/14/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Request of Defendant Comments: Request of the Defendant Judith Win by her counsel Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Judith Win's Assented to Motion to cancel March 14th, 2024 Hearing. (Duplicate filing) With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff); Win, Judith (Defendant); Beeler, Esq., Jeffrey S (Attorney) on behalf of Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff); Lavoie, Esq., Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Win, Judith (Defendant) | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Motion to cancel March 14, 2024 hearing (#190.0): ALLOWED Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Win, Judith (Defendant); Anti, Esq., Dennis Robert (Attorney) on behalf of Win, Judith (Defendant); Beeler, Esq., Jeffrey S (Attorney) on behalf of Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff); Lavoie, Esq., Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Win, Judith (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report, with Certificate of Service and Exhibits 1 & 2, FILED. filed by Applies To: Heineman, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff); Beeler, Esq., Jeffrey S (Attorney) on behalf of Eugene V Anderson Personal Representative for the Estate of Tessa Kathleen Mary Anderson (Plaintiff) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Robert Graves's Notice of filing pursuant to Rule 9A and list of documents filed. 1. Motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report (memorandum in corporated); 2. Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report; 3. Reply in support of motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report; 4. Request for hearing on motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report; and 5. Rule 9A notice of filing. With Certificate of Service. Applies To: Graves, Robert (Defendant); Roberts, Esq., Scott Alan (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Kristan, Esq., Arielle Brooks (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Mitropoulos, Esq., Alexandra Aurelia (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Robert Graves's Motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report (memorandum incorporated pursuant to Rule 9A) with Certificate of Service with Exhibits A-C, FILED. Applies To: Graves, Robert (Defendant); Roberts, Esq., Scott Alan (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Kristan, Esq., Arielle Brooks (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Mitropoulos, Esq., Alexandra Aurelia (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Robert Graves's Request for for a hearing on defendant's motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report, FILED. Applies To: Graves, Robert (Defendant); Roberts, Esq., Scott Alan (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Kristan, Esq., Arielle Brooks (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Mitropoulos, Esq., Alexandra Aurelia (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Defendant Robert Graves reply in support of motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, to report with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Graves, Robert (Defendant); Roberts, Esq., Scott Alan (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Kristan, Esq., Arielle Brooks (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant); Mitropoulos, Esq., Alexandra Aurelia (Attorney) on behalf of Graves, Robert (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.