Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Amaral Enterprises Llc, Bearbones Inc., D B A Morningside Bakery, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Gannett, Esq., Richard William, against B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc., Clary, Jim, Purry, Blake, represented by Courtney, Esq., Mary F, Hamel, Esq., Thomas J, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
|
's
Date: May 27, 2021Received from Defendant Purry, Blake: Answer to original complaint;
Date: July 20, 2015Received from Defendant Clary, Jim: Answer to original complaint;
Date: July 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | 's | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Defendant Blake Purry, B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc., Jim Clary's Request for status of Final Judgment and Execution, received. Applies To: Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc., Clary, Jim, Purry, Blake (Defendant); Courtney, Esq., Mary F (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant) | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of docket entry received from Appeals Court ORDER: (RE#33)-On Nov. 7, 2019-......Accordingly, we award the defendants attorney's fees and costs of $18,731.75. Any proceedings to enforce this award shall be commenced in the Superior Court (Blake, McDonough & Hand, JJ) Applies To: Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff); D/B/A Morningside Bakery (Plaintiff); Amaral Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff); Purry, Blake (Defendant); B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc. (Defendant) | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/ORDER after Rescript: The original judgment (#67.0) is Affirmed in part. The judgment is to be modified to declare that the plaintiffs are not entitled to a judicial remedy for the witnesses' failure to appear and to testify, nor are the plaintiffs entitled to damages for those failures. As so modified, the Judgment is Affirmed. Order denying motion to alter or amend judgment Affirmed Applies To: Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant); Gannett, Esq., Richard William (Attorney) on behalf of Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff); Courtney, Esq., Mary F (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant) | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Rescript received from Appeals Court; judgment AFFIRMED The judgment is to be modified to declare that the plaintiffs are not entitled to a judicial remedy for the witnesses' failure to appear and to testify, nor are the plaintiffs entitled to damages for those failures. As so modified, the Judgment is Affirmed. Order denying motion to alter or amend judgment Affirmed.. Applies To: Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff); D/B/A Morningside Bakery (Plaintiff); B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc. (Defendant) | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal entered in Appeals Court on 06/25/2018 docket number 2018-P-0928 Applies To: Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal: Statement of the Case on Appeal (Cover Sheet). Applies To: Monteleone, Jr., Esq., Robert A (Attorney) on behalf of B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc. (Defendant); Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant); Gannett, Esq., Richard William (Attorney) on behalf of Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff); Courtney, Esq., Mary F (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant) | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal: notice of assembly of record sent to Counsel Applies To: Monteleone, Jr., Esq., Robert A (Attorney) on behalf of B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc. (Defendant); Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant); Gannett, Esq., Richard William (Attorney) on behalf of Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff); Courtney, Esq., Mary F (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant) | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Clerk of the Appeals Court of Assembly of Record Applies To: Monteleone, Jr., Esq., Robert A (Attorney) on behalf of B&G Restaurant Supply, Inc. (Defendant); Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant); Gannett, Esq., Richard William (Attorney) on behalf of Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff); Courtney, Esq., Mary F (Attorney) on behalf of Purry, Blake (Defendant) | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of appeal filed. Applies To: Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff); Amaral Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff); Gannett, Esq., Richard William (Attorney) on behalf of Bearbones Inc. (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.