Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Newton, Mikayla A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ellis, Esq., Scott W, against Guidi, Raymond A, represented by Morse, Esq., Bonnie, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Raymond A Guidi's original complaint Applies To: Ellis, Esq., Scott W (Attorney) on behalf of Newton, Mikayla A (Plaintiff) | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Trial Assignment Conference scheduled for 02/06/2017 03:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 01/18/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 07/27/2016 09:11:29 | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Rule 16 Conference scheduled for 07/26/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled February List -- PreTrial ConferenceWed. 1/18/17 @ 2:00pm | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John B Stewart, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Mikayla A Newton filed. | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Scott W Ellis, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Mikayla A Newton filed. | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Rule 16 status conference on Tuesday, July 26, 2016 at 2:00 pm mailed to counsel Sent On: 12/14/2015 12:43:27 Applies To: Stewart, Esq., John B (Attorney) on behalf of Newton, Mikayla A (Plaintiff); Morse, Esq., Bonnie (Attorney) on behalf of Guidi, Raymond A (Defendant) | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Bonnie Morse, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Raymond A Guidi | |
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Guidi, Raymond A: Answer to original complaint; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.