Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Botello, Christopher, Botello-Phelan, Terri, Botello, Susan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Leone-Quick, Esq., Breton, against Botello, Barbara, represented by Bierwirth, Jr., Esq., Joseph L, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is brought by Christopher Botello, Susan Botello, and Terri Botello-Phelan against their step-mother, Barbara Botello. The plaintiffs allege that Barbara Botello breached a contract and fiduciary duty by diverting assets from their fat...
Defendant Barbara Botello's Motion to dismiss
Date: January 19, 2024Service Returned for Defendant Botello, Barbara: Service made in hand on 9/25/23
Date: October 09, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 13, 2023Complaint WITH JURY CLAIM electronically filed.
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C Applies To: Bierwirth, Jr., Esq., Joseph L (Attorney) on behalf of Botello, Barbara (Defendant) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply to P.#7.3. Applies To: Bierwirth, Jr., Esq., Joseph L (Attorney) on behalf of Botello, Barbara (Defendant) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to to P. #7.1. filed by Christopher Botello, Susan Botello, Terri Botello-Phelan Applies To: Leone-Quick, Esq., Breton (Attorney) on behalf of Botello, Christopher, Botello, Susan, Botello-Phelan, Terri (Plaintiff) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. Applies To: Bierwirth, Jr., Esq., Joseph L (Attorney) on behalf of Botello, Barbara (Defendant) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Barbara Botello's Motion to dismiss | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Barbara Botello's Memorandum in support of P. #7.1. Applies To: Bierwirth, Jr., Esq., Joseph L (Attorney) on behalf of Botello, Barbara (Defendant) | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Notice of intent to file motion to dismiss, 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(9) Applies To: Bierwirth, Jr., Esq., Joseph L (Attorney) on behalf of Botello, Barbara (Defendant) | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend Date to Respond to Complaint (#5.0): ALLOWED There being no opposition, Allowed. | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Barbara Botello's Assented to Motion to extend time for Filing a Response to Complaint | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Botello, Barbara: Service made in hand on 9/25/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.