Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eastern Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shub, Esq., Jeffrey Wayne, against Sosnowski, Barbara M, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts with Robert C. Rufo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Rufo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2010 | |||
April 27, 2010 | |||
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage (Robert C. Rufo, Justice) (copy to atty) | |
March 23, 2010 | |||
March 15, 2010 | |||
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant, Barbara M. Sosnowski. | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Barbara M Sosnowski is not in military service | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of notice by publication returned with service | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of notice by publication issued returnable 3/8/10 | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Mortgagee's Affidavit- has caused to be mailed notice to defendant/mortgagor in compliance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.