Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Powell, Karen, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Resmini, Esq., Ronald J, Creamer, Esq., Ronald Joseph, against Cape Cod Factory Outlet Mall Llc, Boston Equity Limited, Sagamore Realty Trust, represented by Kober, Esq., Peter Christian, Boice, Esq., Lauren Annette, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts with Gary A. Nickerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary A. Nickerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2011 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2012 | |||
July 18, 2012 | |||
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal: failure to comply with nisi order (Gary A. Nickerson, Justice). Copies mailed 6/18/2012 | |
June 15, 2012 | |||
May 14, 2012 | |||
May 09, 2012 | |||
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 6/8/2012 (Gary A. Nickerson, Justice) | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for trial by jury on 5/14/2012 with trial order to RJR, RHS & PCK | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | TRIAL ORDER by (Robert C. Rufo, Justice) | |
January 20, 2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.