Jsl Real Estate Group, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Et Al. Vs Westcor Land Title Insurance Company, A South Carolina Corporation, Et Al.
We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Jsl Real Estate Group, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Et Al. Vs Westcor Land Title Insurance Company, A South Carolina Corporation, Et Al.
Americas Servicing Group Llc A California Limited Liability Company,
Jsl Real Estate Group Llc A California Limited Liability Company,
filed a(n)
Contractual Fraud -
Commercial
case
represented by
Berkowitz Marsha Carol,
against
Dahl Ronald P.,
Southwest Escrow Corporation A California Corporation,
Townsend Latanya J.,
Verdiyan Arusyak,
Westcor Land Title Insurance Company A South Carolina Corporation,
(total of 5)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Superior with Michael R. Amerian presiding.
Case Details for
Americas Servicing Group Llc A California Limited Liability Company v. Dahl Ronald P.
, et al.
This complaint involves a legal case filed by JSL Real Estate Group, LLC and Americas Servicing Group LLC against Westcor Land Title Insurance Company, Southwest Escrow Corporation, Latanya J. Townsend, Arusyak Verdıyan, Ronald P. Dahl, and others. T...
Case Events for
Americas Servicing Group Llc A California Limited Liability Company v. Dahl Ronald P.
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
April 19, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Errata; Filed by: JSL REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAS SERVICING GROUP LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
April 11, 2024
Docket Event
Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: JSL REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAS SERVICING GROUP LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a South Carolina corporation (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No
March 26, 2024
Hearing
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department O
March 22, 2024
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Michael R. Amerian in Department O Van Nuys Courthouse East
Judge: Hon. Michael R. Amerian
March 21, 2024
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JSL REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAS SERVICING GROUP LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a South Carolina corporation (Defendant); SOUTHWEST ESCROW CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); LATANYA J. TOWNSEND (Defendant) et al.
March 21, 2024
Docket Event
Complaint; Filed by: JSL REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAS SERVICING GROUP LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a South Carolina corporation (Defendant); SOUTHWEST ESCROW CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); LATANYA J. TOWNSEND (Defendant) et al.
March 21, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
March 21, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
March 21, 2024
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JSL REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); AMERICAS SERVICING GROUP LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: WESTCOR LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a South Carolina corporation (Defendant); SOUTHWEST ESCROW CORPORATION, a California corporation (Defendant); LATANYA J. TOWNSEND (Defendant) et al.