Case Last Refreshed: 21 hours ago
Shakoor Abdul, Shakoor Seema, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Thakur Pamela Tahim, Zolnekoff Laura Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2024 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Denied | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Juarez Daniel |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Trust |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Seema Shakoor ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Abdul Shakoor ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (Seema ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.