Cantu An Individual Marcelo,
Cantu An Individual Mauricio,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Raucher Stephen L,
against
Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc A California Limited Liability,
All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Properties Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiffs? Title Or Any Cloud On Plaintiffs? Title Thereto,
Xxxxxxxx R As Trustee Of The Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc ?Irrevocable Xxxxx? Dated January 10 2019 Xxxxx,
Tjm Real Estate Investments Inc. A California Corporation,
Welsh As Trustee Of The Lise Welsh Revocable Xxxxx Lise,
(total of 8)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Superior with Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Details for
Cantu An Individual Marcelo v. Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc A California Limited Liability
, et al.
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Marcelo Cantu and Mauricio Cantu against multiple defendants, including ABYLAY ZHAKASHOV, xxx xxxxx xxxxx LLC, xxxxx xxxxxxxx, KERRY WELSH, HELEN WELSH, LISE WELSH, TJM REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS INC., and unknown i...
Parties for
Cantu An Individual Marcelo v. Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc A California Limited Liability
, et al.
Plaintiffs
Cantu An Individual Marcelo
Cantu An Individual Mauricio
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Raucher Stephen L
Defendants
Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc A California Limited Liability
All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Properties Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiffs? Title Or Any Cloud On Plaintiffs? Title Thereto
Xxxxxxxx R As Trustee Of The Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc ?Irrevocable Xxxxx? Dated January 10 2019 Xxxxx
Tjm Real Estate Investments Inc. A California Corporation
Welsh As Trustee Of The Lise Welsh Revocable Xxxxx Lise
Welsh As Trustees Of The Stedgh Xxxxx Dated January 18 2022 Helen
Welsh Kerry
Zhakashov An Individual Abylay
Case Documents for
Cantu An Individual Marcelo v. Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc A California Limited Liability
, et al.
Case Events for
Cantu An Individual Marcelo v. Xxx Xxxxx Xxxxx Llc A California Limited Liability
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 14, 2024
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
March 13, 2024
Docket Event
Complaint; Filed by: Marcelo Cantu, an individual (Plaintiff); Mauricio Cantu, an individual (Plaintiff); All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Properties Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs? Title, or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs? Title Thereto (Defendant); As to: Abylay Zhakashov, an individual (Defendant); xxx xxxxx xxxxx LLC, a California limited liability (Defendant); xxxxx xxxxxxxx, R, as Trustee of the xxx xxxxx xxxxx LLC ?Irrevocable xxxxx? dated January 10, 2019 (Defendant) et al.
March 13, 2024
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marcelo Cantu, an individual (Plaintiff); Mauricio Cantu, an individual (Plaintiff); All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Properties Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs? Title, or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs? Title Thereto (Defendant); As to: Abylay Zhakashov, an individual (Defendant); xxx xxxxx xxxxx LLC, a California limited liability (Defendant); xxxxx xxxxxxxx, R, as Trustee of the xxx xxxxx xxxxx LLC ?Irrevocable xxxxx? dated January 10, 2019 (Defendant) et al.
March 13, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marcelo Cantu, an individual (Plaintiff); Mauricio Cantu, an individual (Plaintiff); All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Properties Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiffs? Title, or Any Cloud on Plaintiffs? Title Thereto (Defendant); As to: Abylay Zhakashov, an individual (Defendant); xxx xxxxx xxxxx LLC, a California limited liability (Defendant); xxxxx xxxxxxxx, R, as Trustee of the xxx xxxxx xxxxx LLC ?Irrevocable xxxxx? dated January 10, 2019 (Defendant) et al.
Apr 09, 2024 |
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
23LBCV01243
Apr 08, 2024 |
Yvette M. Palazuelos
|
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
24STCP01093
Apr 08, 2024 |
Melvin D. Sandvig
|
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
24CHCV01232
Apr 08, 2024 |
Olivia Rosales
|
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
24NWCV01079
Apr 08, 2024 |
Randolph M. Hammock
|
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
24STCV08729
Apr 08, 2024 |
Armen Tamzarian
|
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
24STCV08730
Apr 08, 2024 |
Elihu M. Berle
|
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
24STCV08762
Apr 08, 2024 |
Patrick Timothy Meyers
|
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
24STCV08748