Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
California Department Of Housing And Community Development, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Nick Jack C, against 1030 Fairview Lp, 1130 Broadway Street L.P, 12 Conejo Lp, 1675 Industrial Park Lp, 180 Sanborn Lp, (total of 33) See All represented by Blitz Sarah Alana, Jew Mikle S, Myers Michael S., Nirschl Dustin, Peery Gordon Franklin, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with David S. Cunningham, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2024 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This legal document is a complaint filed by the California Department of Housing and Community Development against various defendants, including Shangri-La Industries LLC and Step Up on Second Street, Inc., regarding multiple violations of statutes a...
Notice of Appearance of Counsel; Filed by: BMO Harris Bank, NA (Defendant)
Date: April 15, 2024Corrected Proof Of Service; Filed by: Qualfax, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: April 16, 2024Certificate of Mailing for (Ex-Parte Proceedings) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 29, 2024Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Setting Case for Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: California Department of Housing and Community Development (Plaintiff)
Date: 2024-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: City of Redlands (Defendant)
Date: 2024-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Arixa Institutional Lending Partners, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-03-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-03-07T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-03-13T00:00:00Declaration Of Robert Abbasi In Support Of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Qualfax, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2024-03-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.