Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
San Bernardino County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Aston, David B., in the jurisdiction of Mendocino County. This case was filed in Mendocino County Superior Courts Superior with Basner, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBasner, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2024 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMendocino County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice
Date: April 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice - Change of Venue Notice - Change of Venue |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations (UIFSA) >Originally Filed 4/20/2011< Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations (UIFSA) >Originally Filed 4/20/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment & POS by Mail >Originally Filed 5/02/2011< Notice of Entry of Judgment & POS by Mail >Originally Filed 5/02/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Dec. for Default or Uncontested Judgment >Originally Filed 4/20/2011< *Dec. for Default or Uncontested Judgment (Governmental) >Originally Filed 4/20/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Judgment >Originally Filed 4/20/2011< Request to Enter Default Judgment (Governmental) >Originally Filed 4/20/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service >Originally Filed 2/28/2011< Proof of Service >Originally Filed 2/28/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Establishing Paternity >Originally Filed 1/18/2011< Affidavit in Support of Establishing Paternity >Originally Filed 1/18/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
General Testimony (UIFSA) >Originally Filed 1/18/2011< General Testimony (UIFSA) >Originally Filed 1/18/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
UIFSA Summons Filed >Orignally Filed 1/18/2011< UIFSA Summons Filed >Orignally Filed 1/18/2011< |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Uniform Support Petition >Originally Filed 1/18/2011< Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.