Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Xxxxx, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Lopez Vix, Mayra Alejandra, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2024 |
CategoryUniform Parentage |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Custody and Special Immigrant JV Findings Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Re: Diligence DECLARATION REGARDING DUE DILIGENCE WHEN RECIPIENT S ADDRESS IS UNKNOWN |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Petition (Family) | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued and Filed | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Child Custody or Visitation Child Custody/Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition: Establish Parental Relationship | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition: Establish Parental Relationship | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Child Custody or Visitation Proposed Child Custody/Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.