Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with Gibson, Gary G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2024 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Status Conference
Judge: Gibson, Gary G |
|
March 04, 2024 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Gibson, Gary G |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 08, 2024 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Gibson, Gary G |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 26, 2024 | Hearing |
DV Temporary Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Gary G |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO)
Judge: Barton, Kathryn J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.