Related Content
in Santa Clara County
Ruling
MASSACHUSETTS EDUCATIONAL FINANCING AUTHORITY VS ALEXANDER
Jul 12, 2024 |
BC682984
Case Number:
BC682984
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
71
Superior Court of California
County of Los Angeles
DEPARTMENT 71
TENTATIVE RULING
MASSACHUSETTS EDUCATIONAL FINANCING AUTHORITY
,
vs.
ALEXANDER
.
Case No.:
BC682984
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Plaintiff Massachusetts Educational Financing Authoritys
unopposed
motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement is granted.
Plaintiff is to submit a judgment to this Court within 10 days of this ruling.
Plaintiff Massachusetts Education Financing Authority (MEFA) (Plaintiff) moves
unopposed
for an order to enter judgment because Defendant Alexander L Ross (Ross) (Defendant) defaulted on the terms and conditions of the parties settlement stipulation.
(Notice of Motion, pg. 1; C.C.P. §664.6.)
Background
On November 09, 2017, Plaintiff filed a Complaint in this Court for damages in the amount of $25,149.19 to recover the unpaid balance on a credit card account.
(Decl. of Rohan ¶2.)
On March 22, 2022, Plaintiff and Defendant executed a settlement agreement (Settlement Agreement), with the Court retaining jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the agreement.
(Decl. of Rohan ¶3, Exh. A.)
Pursuant to ¶10 of the agreement, if Defendant defaulted under the Settlement Agreement, then Plaintiff could obtain a judgment for the outstanding balance, pre-judgment interest and costs through declaration and order.
(
See
Decl. of Rohan ¶¶3-4, Exh. A at ¶10.)
On February 26, 2024, Plaintiff filed the instant motion.
As of the date of this hearing no opposition has been filed by Defendant.
Motion to Enforce Settlement
Legal Standard
C.C.P. §664.6 provides, as follows: If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.
(C.C.P. §664.6(a).)
Disputes regarding the terms of the settlement (or other disputed facts) may be adjudicated on a C.C.P. §664.6 motion on the basis of declarations or other evidence.
(
Malouf Brothers v. Dixon
(1991) 230 Cal.App.3d 280, 284;
Machado v. Myers
(2019) 39 Cal.App.5th 779, 795-796 [stating court may resolve reasonable disputes over terms of settlement agreement but may not modify terms from what was agreed to by parties].)
Discussion
Plaintiff submitted evidence that Plaintiff and Defendant executed a Settlement Agreement that is signed by the parties and contains a provision authorizing this Court to retain jurisdiction under C.C.P. §664.6.
(Decl. of
Rohan ¶2
, Exh. A.)
Accordingly, Plaintiff submitted evidence of the existence of a valid settlement agreement and is therefore entitled to an order enforcing the settlement.
Plaintiffs counsel declares Defendant last made a payment on September 9, 2014.
(Decl. of Rohan ¶4.)
Plaintiffs counsel declares that on March 16, 2023, he last sent a cure letter to Defendant, stating that Defendant had ten days to cure the defect.
(Decl. of Rohan ¶6.)
Plaintiffs counsel declares Defendant did not cure the defect and Defendant has not made any other payments pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement.
(Decl. of Rohan ¶¶6-7.)
Plaintiffs counsel declares the principal outstanding balance on Defendants account is $10,552.09.
(Decl. of Rohan ¶8.)
Plaintiff requests a judgment against Defendant in the amount of $11,073.93, reflecting a principal balance of $25,149.19, less $14,075.26 in credits for payments made, and $0.00 in costs.
Based on the foregoing, Plaintiffs motion
to enforce the Settlement Agreement and enter judgment against Defendant in the amount of $11,073.93, reflecting a principal balance of $25,149.19, less $14,075.26 in credits for payments made, and $0.00 in costs is granted.
Conclusion
Plaintiffs
unopposed
motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement and enter judgment against Defendant in the amount of $11,073.93, reflecting a principal balance of $25,149.19, less $14,075.26 in credits for payments made, and $0.00 in costs is granted.
Plaintiff is to submit a judgment to the Court within 10 days of this ruling.
Moving Party to give notice.
Dated:
July _____, 2024
Hon. Daniel M. Crowley
Judge of the Superior Court
Ruling
Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc., vs. Castro
Jul 10, 2024 |
23CVG-00362
CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., VS. CASTRO
Case Number: 23CVG-00362
Tentative Ruling on Motion for Terminating Sanctions: Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. moves
for terminating sanctions by striking Defendant Vincent Castro’s answer. Plaintiff also requests sanctions in the
amount of $1,572.75 for each motion.
Procedural Defect: As a procedural matter, this motion was served both via mail and email on May 9, 2024, and
set for a hearing date of June 7, 2024. CCP § 1005(b) requires all moving papers be served 16 court days before
the hearing. This notice period is extended by five calendar days if the motion is served by mail. Id. For service
by email, the notice period is extended by two court days. CCP § 1010.6(a)(3). This timeframe is calculated by
counting backwards from the hearing date but excluding the hearing date. CCP § 12c.
Starting with the June 7, 2024, hearing date and counting backwards 16 court days (excluding the Court holiday
of May 27, 2024) then five calendar days for out of state mailing this matter should have been served by mail no
later than, May 4, 2024. For email the last day to serve the motion was April 24, 2024. The motion was served
on May 7, 2024, and was untimely under either calculation. Based on insufficient statutory notice, the motion is
denied.
Merits of Motion: Even if the motion had been timely noticed, terminating sanctions are not warranted.
Terminating sanctions are a “drastic penalty and should be used sparingly.” Lopez v. Watchtower Bible & Tract
Society of New York, Inc. (2016) 246 Cal.App.4th 566, 604. A terminating sanction should not generally be
imposed by the court until less severe sanctions have been attempted and were unsuccessful. Id. No justification
has been provided as to why terminating sanctions are appropriate in this context instead of lesser evidentiary or
issue sanctions. Without additional evidence, terminating sanctions would be premature.
The motion is DENIED. A proposed order was lodged with the Court which will be modified to reflect the
denial.
Review Hearing: This matter is also on calendar for review regarding trial re-setting. The Court designates this
matter as a Plan II case and intends on setting it for trial no later than October 15, 2024. An appearance is
necessary on today’s calendar to discuss available trial dates.
Ruling
Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc., vs. Castro
Jul 14, 2024 |
23CVG-00362
CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., VS. CASTRO
Case Number: 23CVG-00362
Tentative Ruling on Motion for Terminating Sanctions: Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. moves
for terminating sanctions by striking Defendant Vincent Castro’s answer. Plaintiff also requests sanctions in the
amount of $1,572.75 for each motion.
Procedural Defect: As a procedural matter, this motion was served both via mail and email on May 9, 2024, and
set for a hearing date of June 7, 2024. CCP § 1005(b) requires all moving papers be served 16 court days before
the hearing. This notice period is extended by five calendar days if the motion is served by mail. Id. For service
by email, the notice period is extended by two court days. CCP § 1010.6(a)(3). This timeframe is calculated by
counting backwards from the hearing date but excluding the hearing date. CCP § 12c.
Starting with the June 7, 2024, hearing date and counting backwards 16 court days (excluding the Court holiday
of May 27, 2024) then five calendar days for out of state mailing this matter should have been served by mail no
later than, May 4, 2024. For email the last day to serve the motion was April 24, 2024. The motion was served
on May 7, 2024, and was untimely under either calculation. Based on insufficient statutory notice, the motion is
denied.
Merits of Motion: Even if the motion had been timely noticed, terminating sanctions are not warranted.
Terminating sanctions are a “drastic penalty and should be used sparingly.” Lopez v. Watchtower Bible & Tract
Society of New York, Inc. (2016) 246 Cal.App.4th 566, 604. A terminating sanction should not generally be
imposed by the court until less severe sanctions have been attempted and were unsuccessful. Id. No justification
has been provided as to why terminating sanctions are appropriate in this context instead of lesser evidentiary or
issue sanctions. Without additional evidence, terminating sanctions would be premature.
The motion is DENIED. A proposed order was lodged with the Court which will be modified to reflect the
denial.
Review Hearing: This matter is also on calendar for review regarding trial re-setting. The Court designates this
matter as a Plan II case and intends on setting it for trial no later than October 15, 2024. An appearance is
necessary on today’s calendar to discuss available trial dates.
Ruling
ROCK CREEK CAPITAL, LLC VS NORMA S CARCAMO
Jul 11, 2024 |
23CHCV00264
Case Number:
23CHCV00264
Hearing Date:
July 11, 2024
Dept:
F47 Dept. F47
Date: 7/11/24
Case #23CHCV00264
MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED
Motion filed on 4/4/24.
MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Rock Creek Capital, LLC
RESPONDING PARTY: Defendant Norma S. Carcamo
NOTICE: ok
RELIEF REQUESTED
: An order
deeming the truth of matters specified in Plaintiffs Request for Admissions served on Defendant Norma S. Carcamo.
RULING
: The motion is granted.
SUMMARY OF ACTION & PROCEDURAL HISTORY
On 1/30/23, Plaintiff Rock Creek Capital, LLC (Plaintiff) filed this action against Defendant Norma S. Carcamo (Defendant) for breach of contract.
On 4/4/23, Defendant, representing herself, filed an answer to the complaint.
On 2/2/24, Plaintiff served Defendant, by
U.S. Mail, with Requests for Admissions, Set 1.
(Aguirre Decl., Ex.1).
Defendant failed to serve responses.
(Aguirre Decl.).
Therefore, on 4/4/24, Plaintiff filed and served the instant motion seeking an order deeming the truth of matters specified in Plaintiffs Request for Admissions served on Defendant.
Defendant has not opposed or otherwise responded to the motion.
ANALYSIS
Due to Defendants failure to respond to the Requests for Admissions, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the matters admitted.
CCP 2033.280(b), (c).
CONCLUSION
The motion is granted.
Ruling
ALIGN TECHNOLOGY, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. BRADLEY HUNT SANTELLI, A.K.A. BRAD H. SANTELLI, ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 |
CGC23610444
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Thursday, July 11, 2024, Line 9. PLAINTIFF ALIGN TECHNOLOGY, INC.'s Motion For Assignment Of Rights, Restraining Order and turnover order. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for assignment of rights, restraining order and turnover order is granted. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/RBU)
Ruling
VANESA O'HANLON VS. TONY GARNICKI ET AL
Jul 11, 2024 |
CGC23610527
Matter on the Law & Motion calendar for Thursday, July 11, 2024, Line 16. PLAINTIFF VANESA O'HANLON's Application And Hearing For Right To Attach Order And Writ Of Attachment. "Plaintiff's application for right to attach order and order for issuance of writ of attachment" is denied. This action regards a series of oral loans - several involving credit cards - that plaintiff allegedly made to defendant and he did not fully re-pay. The motion is denied for two principal reasons. First, the amount of plaintiff's claims is not "fixed or readily ascertainable." (CCP 483.010(a).) For example, plaintiff concedes she is "unable to locate my credit card statements to correctly charge" defendant. (O'Hanlon Dec. 3:1-3.) Second, plaintiff has not "established the probable validity" of her claims. (CCP 484.090(a)(2).) For example, plaintiff concedes the loans - all oral - began "in April 2017," raising serious statute-of-limitations issues. (O'Hanlon Dec. 1:25; CCP 339.) The court does not rely on defendant's untimely opposition for the above, but rather plaintiff's own declaration. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript msay be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. =(302/RBU)
Ruling
- ROCKY TOP RENTALS LLC vs STANLEY, ROBERT JASON
Jul 10, 2024 |
CV-23-002760
CV-23-002760 - ROCKY TOP RENTALS LLC vs STANLEY, ROBERT JASON - Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession - DENIED, as MOOT, in view of entry of Defendants’ defaults on 6-24-24.
Ruling
DISCOVER BANK VS SARMIENTO
Jul 10, 2024 |
MVC2004794
DISCOVER BANK VS MOTION TO VACATE NOTICE OF
MVC2004794
SARMIENTO SETTLEMENT BY DISCOVER BANK
Tentative Ruling: No tentative ruling.
Appearance is required.
Document
CIG Financial, LLC vs Samuel Ayala
Jul 10, 2024 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
24CV442808
Document
Bank Of America, N.a. vs Craig Janik
Jul 10, 2024 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
24CV442803
Document
LVNV Funding LLC vs Cristy Viola
Jul 10, 2024 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000 |
24CV442814
Document
Lvnv Funding Llc vs Shreeram Kafle
Jul 11, 2024 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
24CV442890
Document
Citibank, N.a. vs Ian Caporali
Jul 11, 2024 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000 |
Collections Rule 3.740 Limited (09) - under 10,000 |
24CV442865