Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GONZALEZ ANASVISCA vs DENISON, et al.
On May 30, 2024 a civil unlimited (motor vehicle - personal inju...) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Jenna M. Whitman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 30, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 04, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Category
Civil Unlimited (Motor Vehicle - Personal Inju...)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal action for personal injury filed by Plaintiff Raul Gonzalez Anavisca against Defendants Michael Allen Denison, Bay Advanced Technologies, LLC, Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc., and others. The incident occurred on o…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 25 |
|
October 16, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
May 31, 2024 | Case assigned to Hon. Jenna Whitman in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse | ||
May 31, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 | ||
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Jenna Whitman in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Raul Gonzalez Anasvisca (Plaintiff) As to: Michael Allen Denison (Defendant); BAY ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a corporation (Defendant) Document |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: Raul Gonzalez Anasvisca (Plaintiff) As to: Michael Allen Denison (Defendant); BAY ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a corporation (Defendant) Document |
|
May 30, 2024 | Notice of Case Assignment | ||
May 30, 2024 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
May 30, 2024 | Summons on Complaint | ||
May 30, 2024 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
May 30, 2024 | Complaint | ||
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Raul Gonzalez Anasvisca (Plaintiff) As to: Michael Allen Denison (Defendant); BAY ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a corporation (Defendant) Document |