Mark Peterson,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
against
American Honda Motor Company, Inc.,
Diego Lucasantonio,
D Lucas Trucking Inc,
D Lucas Trucking Llc,
Honda Motor Company, Ltd.,
(total of 8)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
Superior Court of Alameda County with Jenna M. Whitman presiding.
Case Details for
Mark Peterson v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
, et al.
Civil Unlimited (Motor Vehicle - Personal Inju...)
Last Refreshed
June 04, 2024
Practice Area
Torts
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
Automobile
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a wrongful death and survival action case filed by Mark Peterson against multiple defendants. The incident involved a collision between a freightliner tractor trailer driven by Diego Lucasantonio and a Honda Civic driven by Misti Pe...
Case Events for
Mark Peterson v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
October 16, 2024
Docket Event
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 25
October 16, 2024
Initial Case Management Conference
May 31, 2024
Case assigned to Hon. Jenna Whitman in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse
May 31, 2024
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25
May 31, 2024
Docket Event
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event
May 31, 2024
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Jenna Whitman in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment
May 30, 2024
Docket Event
Complaint Filed by: MARK PETERSON (Plaintiff) As to: D LUCAS TRUCKING INC (Defendant); DIEGO LUCASANTONIO (Defendant); D LUCAS TRUCKING LLC (Defendant) et al. Document