Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GAMINO vs TESLA MOTORS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION
On May 21, 2024 a civil unlimited (contract/warranty breach - se...) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. Judge Elizabeth A. Grimes presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 21, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 27, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Category
Civil Unlimited (Contract/Warranty Breach - Se...)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference HHJ / Department 512 |
|
October 07, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
May 24, 2024 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Monica Alicia B. Gamino (Plaintiff) As to: Tesla Motors, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) Service Cost Waived: No Service Cost: 30.00 Service Date: 05/23/2024 Document |
|
May 22, 2024 | Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth Riles in Department 512 Hayward Hall of Justice | ||
May 22, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2024 at 09:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 | ||
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth Riles in Department 512 Hayward Hall of Justice Assignment |
|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2024 at 09:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 512 Event |
|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Monica Alicia B. Gamino (Plaintiff) As to: Tesla Motors, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) Document |
|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by: Monica Alicia B. Gamino (Plaintiff) As to: Tesla Motors, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) Document |
|
May 21, 2024 | Notice of Case Assignment | ||
May 21, 2024 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
May 21, 2024 | Summons on Complaint | ||
May 21, 2024 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
May 21, 2024 | Complaint | ||
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Monica Alicia B. Gamino (Plaintiff) As to: Tesla Motors, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) Document |