Bernice Turner,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
against
Premise Health Of California Medical P.C.,
Primehealth Staffing Llc,
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
Superior Court of Alameda County with Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Details for
Bernice Turner v. Premise Health Of California Medical P.C.
, et al.
Case Events for
Bernice Turner v. Premise Health Of California Medical P.C.
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
August 26, 2024
Docket Event
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 23
August 26, 2024
Initial Case Management Conference
June 04, 2024
Docket Event
Complex Determination Hearing RCD / Department 23
June 04, 2024
Complex Determination Hearing
April 26, 2024
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Bernice Turner (Plaintiff) As to: Premise Health of California Medical P.C. (Defendant) Document
April 26, 2024
Docket Event
Complaint Filed by: Bernice Turner (Plaintiff) As to: Premise Health of California Medical P.C. (Defendant); PrimeHealth Staffing LLC (Defendant) Document
April 26, 2024
Case assigned to Hon. Michael Markman in Department 23 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse
April 26, 2024
The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex – Case Type
April 26, 2024
Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23
April 26, 2024
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23