We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Ally Bank ,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Joseph Tafari Woodson ,
against
Kalajah E. Bennet ,
Ronald Hughes ,
in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.
This case was filed in
Alameda County
Superior Courts
Superior Court of Alameda County with Jenna M. Whitman presiding.
Filing Date
April 16, 2024
Category
Civil Limited (Other Breach Of Contract/Warr...)
Last Refreshed
April 19, 2024
Filing Location
Alameda County, CA
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Filing Court House
Superior Court of Alameda County
Case Events for
Ally Bank v. Kalajah E. Bennet
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
November 06, 2024
Docket Event
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 25
November 06, 2024
Initial Case Management Conference
April 17, 2024
Case assigned to Hon. Jenna Whitman in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse
April 17, 2024
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/06/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/06/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event
April 17, 2024
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Jenna Whitman in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Ally Bank (Plaintiff) As to: Ronald Hughes (Defendant); Kalajah E. Bennet (Defendant) Document
Get Document
April 16, 2024
Docket Event
Complaint Filed by: Ally Bank (Plaintiff) As to: Ronald Hughes (Defendant); Kalajah E. Bennet (Defendant) Document
Get Document
April 16, 2024
Notice of Case Assignment
April 16, 2024
Notice of Case Management Conference
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.