Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Eric Lamont Merritt, An Individual And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by David D. Bibiyan, Zachary Tyler Chrzan, against Team Volkswagen Of Hayward Corporation, A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with Michael M. Markman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Other Employment Complaint Case) |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference RCD / Department 23 |
|
July 29, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complex Determination Hearing RCD / Department 23 |
|
May 14, 2024 | Complex Determination Hearing | ||
April 02, 2024 | Case assigned to Hon. Michael Markman in Department 23 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse | ||
April 02, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 | ||
April 02, 2024 | Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 02:30 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Michael Markman in Department 23 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.