Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Richmond, Julie, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Taylor, Clifford, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Kim, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2024 |
CategoryRequest For Elder Or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Elder or Dependent Adult Protection
Judge: Kim, David |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Elder or Dependent Adult Protection
Judge: Kim, David |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Kim, David |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance **Tro expires 5/17/24** |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Request to Continue Court Date | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Restraining Order as of: TRO |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Petition filed | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Expires on *5/3/24* |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Kim, David |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.