Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Contrarian Investors Fund, Llc, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Frasier, Jeffrey Scott, against Patoka, Kathrina, represented by Bailey, Joshua B., in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Honigsberg, Christopher M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHonigsberg, Christopher M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2024 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
|
PATOKA - Civil Case Cover Sheet CM-010
Date: April 22, 2024Decl Patoka ISO Writ of Attachment 1
Date: April 18, 2024JBB Decl ISO Writ of Attachment 1
Date: April 18, 202495390Stipu000820
Date: April 05, 2024Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte
Date: March 27, 2024Declaration of Sean Lewis in Support
Date: March 27, 2024Declaration of Lucas A. Davidson
Date: March 27, 20242024 0327 Contrarian Ex Parte Appl for A TRO
Date: March 27, 20242024 0327 Decl. of Jami Audelo
Date: March 27, 2024OC170313_NtcErrata
Date: March 27, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Injunction_____B Continued from 04/09/2024 Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | PATOKA - Civil Case Cover Sheet CM-010 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96376DEFEN04f1a1 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96376DEFEN0354c3 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96376DECLA021dc0 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96376DECLA010d6e | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96376REQUE006da0 | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Ex Parte Application | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application For for Right to Attach Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.