Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Caloiaro, Angelo, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Canada, Richard Brent, against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., A Michigan Corporation, Rocket Mortgage, Llc, A Michigan Limited Liability Company, Santa Cruz Beach, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Spotswood, Roger R., The Edna Catherine Messini Revocable Living Trust Dated August 25, 1989, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2024 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2024.03.21 App. and Order for Publication
Date: March 22, 20242024.03.21 Dec of RBC ISO App. for Publication
Date: March 22, 20242024.03.13 POS of Summons - Mortgage Elec
Date: March 19, 20242024.03.12 POS of Summons - Santa Cruz
Date: March 19, 20242024.03.12 POS of Summons - Spotswood
Date: March 19, 20242024.03.13 POS of Summons - Rocket Mort
Date: March 19, 20242024.03.12 Lis Pendens - Recorded
Date: March 12, 202493209Summo026076
Date: March 05, 202493209Civil016f61
Date: March 05, 202493209Verif002aa2
Date: March 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Plaintiff Caloiaro, Angelo |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application - No Fee Party: Plaintiff Caloiaro, Angelo |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.21 App. and Order for Publication | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.21 Dec of RBC ISO App. for Publication | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Date served: 03/13/2024 |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Date served: 03/12/2024 |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.13 POS of Summons - Mortgage Elec | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.12 POS of Summons - Santa Cruz | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.12 POS of Summons - Spotswood | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.13 POS of Summons - Rocket Mort |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.