Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Mcmenamin, Gerald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Staskus, Kim David, against Ellison Environmental, Inc., Wells, Chaz Ray, represented by Schrader, Daniel P., in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Schmal, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchmal, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2024 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NTC
Date: March 19, 2024NTC JF
Date: March 19, 2024ANS
Date: March 19, 2024Proof of Service - Wells
Date: March 18, 2024(30852914) Affidavit
Date: February 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NTC | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NTC JF | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ANS | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Date served: 03/15/2024 |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance Filed | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited Party: Defendant Ellison Environmental, Inc.; Defendant Wells, Chaz Ray |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Nonrefundable) Party: Defendant Ellison Environmental, Inc.; Defendant Wells, Chaz Ray |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Wells | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Date served: 02/16/2024 |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | (30852914) Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.