Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Kiefer, Ashley, Kiefer, James, filed a(n) (24) Unlimited Product Liability case represented by Sanguinetti, Elise Rochelle, against Future Motion, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2024 |
Category(24) Unlimited Product Liability |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2024-03-18 Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: March 19, 20242024-03-05 Kiefer CMS
Date: March 05, 20242024-02-13 Notice of Related Case
Date: February 13, 20242024-02-09 Summons
Date: February 09, 20242024-02-09 Civil Coversheet
Date: February 09, 20242024-02-09 Complaint
Date: February 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Nonrefundable) Party: Plaintiff Kiefer, James; Plaintiff Kiefer, Ashley |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-03-18 Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Party: Plaintiff Kiefer, James; Plaintiff Kiefer, Ashley |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-03-05 Kiefer CMS | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024-02-13 Notice of Related Case | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.