Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Vargas, Angelica M. Martinez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mejia, John V, against Long-Ponce, Laurie A., Ponce, Carlos, Sandoval, Reynaldo Ponce, represented by Swenson, Rich A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2024 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
DJT - vargs v. sandoval
Date: March 13, 2024ANSWER - vargs v. sandoval
Date: March 13, 2024Proof of Service
Date: February 14, 2024(26066308)10398933
Date: February 13, 2024Martinez Vargas_Complaint
Date: February 08, 2024Martinez Vargas_Summons
Date: February 08, 2024Martinez Vargas_CivCover
Date: February 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Defendant Long-Ponce, Laurie A.; Defendant Ponce, Carlos; Defendant Sandoval, Reynaldo Ponce |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited Party: Defendant Long-Ponce, Laurie A.; Defendant Ponce, Carlos; Defendant Sandoval, Reynaldo Ponce |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | DJT - vargs v. sandoval | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER - vargs v. sandoval | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Date served: 02/10/2024 |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Party served: Plaintiff Vargas, Angelica M. Martinez |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Date served: 02/10/2024 |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) Party served: Plaintiff Vargas, Angelica M. Martinez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.