Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2024 |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2024 |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
2024.03.14 Joinder in Dfts MTC Arbitration
Date: March 19, 20242024.03.13 Decl of RV iso MTC Arb
Date: March 13, 20242024.03.13 Decl of RG iso MTC Arb
Date: March 13, 20242024.03.13 Decl of AP iso MTC Arb
Date: March 13, 20242024.03.13 Ntc of Mtn & MTC Arb
Date: March 13, 20242024.03.14 BF_LF Joinder in Dfts MTC Arbitration
Date: March 14, 20242024.03.11 Decl of Prejudice
Date: March 11, 202493281Notic00197e
Date: March 05, 202491859Proof0042c3
Date: February 13, 202491859Proof015832
Date: February 13, 202491805Proof01faa0
Date: February 12, 202491805Proof0254b7
Date: February 12, 202491805Proof0356e2
Date: February 12, 202491805Proof00f86f
Date: February 12, 202491136Notic00718c
Date: February 01, 202490397Compl00036b
Date: January 20, 202490397Civil027db3
Date: January 20, 202490397Summo019a4c
Date: January 20, 202490397Civil03ab09
Date: January 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.14 Joinder in Dfts MTC Arbitration | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.14 BF_LF Joinder in Dfts MTC Arbitration | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.13 Decl of RV iso MTC Arb | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.13 Decl of RG iso MTC Arb | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.13 Decl of AP iso MTC Arb | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.13 Ntc of Mtn & MTC Arb | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.11 Decl of Prejudice | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 93281Notic00197e | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 91859Proof0042c3 | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 91859Proof015832 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.