Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2024 |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
2024.04.10 Notice of Ruling
Date: April 10, 2024final Baywa NEO re Motion to Stay
Date: April 05, 2024Reply MPA ISO Motion to Stay or Dismiss
Date: March 27, 20242024.03.21 Dec of Carolina Nunez
Date: March 22, 20242024.03.21 Pltf Opp to Def Mtn to Stay
Date: March 22, 20242024.03.21 Pltf Ntc of Opp
Date: March 22, 202493459Proof0408f8
Date: March 07, 202493459SPECI02e9a2
Date: March 07, 202493459DECLA017bae
Date: March 07, 202493459SPECI005f5c
Date: March 07, 20242024.02.05 Convex Returned POS
Date: February 07, 20242024.02.01 RSG Returned POS
Date: February 02, 20242024.01.26 QBE Ins. UK Limited Returned POS
Date: February 02, 20242024.01.12 CA Complaint
Date: January 13, 20242024.01.12 Summons with Attachment
Date: January 13, 20242024.01.12 Cover Sheet Addendum
Date: January 13, 20242024.01.12 Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 13, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.04.10 Notice of Ruling | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | final Baywa NEO re Motion to Stay | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply MPA ISO Motion to Stay or Dismiss | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.21 Dec of Carolina Nunez | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.21 Pltf Opp to Def Mtn to Stay | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.21 Pltf Ntc of Opp | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 93459Proof0408f8 | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 93459SPECI02e9a2 | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 93459DECLA017bae | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 93459SPECI005f5c |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.