Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Zimmer, Jana, filed a(n) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) case against Board Of Supervisors Of The County Of Santa Barbara, County Of Santa Barbara, Hazard, Rob, Plowman, Lisa, Seawards, Travis, (total of 6) See All represented by Kim, Callie Patton, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2024 |
CategoryUnlimited Writ Of Mandate (02) |
Last RefreshedJune 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
The legal document involves a complaint filed by Jana Zimmer, represented by the Law Office of Andréa Marcus and Richard C. Solomon, against the Board of Supervisors of Santa Barbara County and other officials. The complaint addresses alleged violati...
Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: June 17, 2024Objection, Filed
Date: June 20, 2024Objection, Filed
Date: June 18, 2024Notice of Continuance, Filed
Date: May 01, 2024Opposition, Filed
Date: April 22, 2024Reply, Filed
Date: April 22, 2024Opposition, Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: May 07, 2024Opposition, Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Response, Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: January 17, 2024Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Petition for Writ of Mandate, Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Motion, Filed
Date: March 12, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: March 12, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Summons Issued, Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Demurrer, Filed
Date: March 12, 2024Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: May 22, 2024Motion: Strike
Date: April 29, 2024Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 29, 2024Reply, Filed
Date: April 22, 2024Notice of Change of Address, Filed
Date: May 22, 2024COSB Amended Obj to Supp RJN 06 20 24
Date: June 20, 202424CV00199.COSB.Obj.Suppl.RJN
Date: June 19, 2024Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 17, 2024POS050 EFS050 Proof of Electronic Service
Date: May 22, 2024MC040 Notice of Change of Address
Date: May 22, 2024COSB Ntc Continuance Hearing Mtn to Strike; Demurrer; Prf Svc 05-01-2024
Date: May 01, 202424CV00199.COSB Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 22, 202424CV00199.COSB.Reply.in.Support.of.Motion to Strike.COSB
Date: April 22, 202424CV00199.COSB Reply in Support of Demurrer Decl.Exh.A.CPK
Date: April 22, 2024JZ notice new fax signed_000001
Date: April 23, 2024Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to
Date: April 16, 2024Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 16, 2024Opposition to Demurrer
Date: April 16, 2024Plaintiff ex parte application Rule 3.1113
Date: April 15, 2024Resp.Pet.Ex.P.App.Dec.Ord.24CV00199
Date: April 15, 2024COSB RJN ISO Demurrer 03.12.24
Date: March 12, 2024COSB Motion to Stike 03.12.24 CK
Date: March 12, 2024COSB Demurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandate 03.12.24 CK
Date: March 12, 2024Summons
Date: January 16, 2024Civil Case Cover sheet addendum
Date: January 16, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2024Verified Petition
Date: January 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: Judge Colleen K. Sterne |
|
July 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Demurrer
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
July 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion: Strike
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
June 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection, Filed re COUNTY OF SANTA BARBARAS AMENDED OBJECTION TO PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE |
|
June 20, 2024 | Docket Event | COSB Amended Obj to Supp RJN 06 20 24 | |
June 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 24CV00199.COSB.Obj.Suppl | |
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection, Filed re County of Santa Barbara's Objection to Petitioner's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice, Filed |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice | |
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
POS050 EFS050 Proof of Electronic Service Proof of Electronic Service, Filed re Notice of Change of Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.