Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2024 |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
95838ANSWE00e884
Date: April 12, 202494294NOTIC001e80
Date: March 20, 2024[final] FAC
Date: March 12, 202492184Motio01bf14
Date: February 16, 202492184Decla026817
Date: February 16, 202492184Answe00338a
Date: February 16, 2024489115B FILE POS
Date: January 24, 2024489115A FILE POS
Date: January 24, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | 95838ANSWE00e884 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | 94294NOTIC001e80 | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | [final] FAC | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 92184Motio01bf14 | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 92184Decla026817 | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 92184Answe00338a | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 489115B FILE POS | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 489115A FILE POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.