Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Paul Betenbaugh, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Gurnee Mason Rushford Bonotto & Forestiere Llp, A California Limited Liability Partnership, Phillip R Bonotto, Safeco Insurance Company Of America, A New Hampshire Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
Category(Fraud (No Contract)) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue
Date: November 07, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 14, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2023Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: February 02, 2024Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: January 05, 2024Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue
Date: November 07, 2023Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: December 12, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 20, 2023Minutes
Date: December 20, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 07, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 07, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 01, 2023Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 27, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 01, 2023Minutes
Date: April 12, 2023Transfer In Case Documents
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 16, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 02, 2023Register of Actions (of Incoming Case)
Date: February 02, 2024Record & Notice of Transfer & Return Receipt
Date: January 30, 2024Summons on Complaint
Date: September 16, 2022Stipulation and Order to Continue Motion to Stay
Date: November 14, 2023Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay
Date: November 07, 2023Complaint
Date: September 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue
Date: November 01, 2023Notice Rescheduling CMC
Date: March 13, 2023Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: September 25, 2023Minutes
Date: July 12, 2023Minute Order
Date: January 11, 2024Case Management Statement
Date: September 12, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 20, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 04, 2024Minute Order Granting Motion to Transfer
Date: December 06, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue
Date: November 07, 2023Minutes
Date: September 13, 2023Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: December 18, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 05, 2023Notice of Continued Hearing Date
Date: January 03, 2024Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: February 02, 2024Notice of Disassociation of Counsel
Date: December 28, 2023Order Granting Motion to Stay
Date: December 06, 2023Notice Changing Location of Hearing
Date: December 18, 2023Minutes
Date: January 10, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 |
Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference Document |
||
February 02, 2024 |
Register of Actions (of Incoming Case) Document |
||
February 02, 2024 |
Notice of Incoming Transfer Document |
||
January 30, 2024 |
Record & Notice of Transfer & Return Receipt Document |
||
January 11, 2024 |
Minute Order Document |
||
January 10, 2024 |
Minutes Document |
||
January 05, 2024 |
Order Regarding Remote Appearance Document |
||
January 04, 2024 |
Notice of Remote Appearance Document |
||
January 03, 2024 |
Notice of Continued Hearing Date Document |
||
December 28, 2023 |
Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.