Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Awwad, Safa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yang, Michelle, against Ford Motor Company, A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2024 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
(31903539) Affidavit
Date: April 10, 20243.31.24 Awwad Safa v FMC - cccs
Date: April 05, 20243.31.24 Awwad Safa v FMC - summons
Date: April 05, 20243.31.24 Awwad Safa v FMC - complaint
Date: April 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | (31903539) Affidavit | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 3.31.24 Awwad Safa v FMC - cccs | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 3.31.24 Awwad Safa v FMC - summons | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 3.31.24 Awwad Safa v FMC - complaint | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued and Filed Summons |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.