Case Last Refreshed: 21 hours ago
Starstone National Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Taylor J Morgan, against Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc., represented by Kevin James Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2024 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration of KJR
Date: March 08, 2024Memo Points and Authorities
Date: March 08, 2024Notice of Motion
Date: March 08, 2024POS 3853
Date: March 04, 2024Proposed Order
Date: March 08, 2024Braga Affidavit of Service
Date: February 13, 2024Summons
Date: February 05, 2024Civil Case Coversheet
Date: February 05, 2024Complaint
Date: February 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of KJR | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Memo Points and Authorities | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Demurrer | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | POS 3853 | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.