Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Burns, Allison, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bellotti, Jerome Patrick, against Melendez, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Pillsbury Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2024 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
POS
Date: April 26, 2024Burns A - Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 19, 2024Burns A - Summons
Date: March 12, 2024Burns A - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 12, 2024Burns A - Complaint
Date: March 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | POS | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Demand: Jury Trial | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Burns A - Demand for Jury Trial | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued and Filed | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Burns A - Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.