Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Solorio, Gilbert, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Becker, Hannah, against Embassy Suites Employer Llc, represented by Nakabayashi, Shannon L Bettis, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Pillsbury Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2024 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice to State Court and Adverse Party
Date: March 26, 2024Removal
Date: February 22, 2024Answer
Date: February 14, 202490344Proof00ef6a
Date: January 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice DEFENDANT EMBASSY SUITES EMPLOYER LLC'S NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice to State Court and Adverse Party | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Removal | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer (Unlimited) | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 90344Proof00ef6a | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER REGARDING COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.