Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Murillo, Guadalupe, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Orbit Truckyard, Orbit Truck Yard, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts Superior with Donabed, Monika presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims $1,500.01-$5,000.00 |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Court Trial Judge: Donabed, Monika |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Unsuccessful Service: Law Enforcement Agency | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: MacLaren, Peter |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Claim - Plaintiff | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Unsuccessful Service: Law Enforcement Agency | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Claim - Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.