Guerra Mialeah,
Leano Jackson Tina Marie,
Leano Maribea Alice,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Shamtoob Jason,
against
Borghani Vahid,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
Superior with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Details for
Guerra Mialeah v. Borghani Vahid
, et al.
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Last Refreshed
April 03, 2024
Practice Area
Torts
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Matter Type
Automobile
Filing Court House
Superior
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Tina Marie Leano Jackson, Maribea Alice Leano, and Mialeah Guerra against Vahid Borghani. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, stating that their actions caused injuries and...
Case Events for
Guerra Mialeah v. Borghani Vahid
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 28, 2024
Docket Event
Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Tina Marie Leano Jackson (Plaintiff); Maribea Alice Leano (Plaintiff); Mialeah Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Vahid Borghani (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 162.92; Service Cost Waived: No
March 18, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
March 18, 2024
Hearing
Case Management Conference scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47
Judge: Melvin D. Sandvig
March 15, 2024
Docket Event
Case assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse
Judge: Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig
March 14, 2024
Docket Event
Complaint; Filed by: Tina Marie Leano Jackson (Plaintiff); Maribea Alice Leano (Plaintiff); Mialeah Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Vahid Borghani (Defendant)
March 14, 2024
Docket Event
Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tina Marie Leano Jackson (Plaintiff); Maribea Alice Leano (Plaintiff); Mialeah Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Vahid Borghani (Defendant)
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tina Marie Leano Jackson (Plaintiff); Maribea Alice Leano (Plaintiff); Mialeah Guerra (Plaintiff); As to: Vahid Borghani (Defendant)
March 14, 2024
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk