Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with Baker, Stephen H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion/Other Predisposition Hearing
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Civil Harassment Temporary Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Recusal M. Bigelow | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Recusal M. McKee | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Recusal T. Wood | |
March 14, 2024 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Stomberg, Nannette J |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Recusal K. Barton | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Recusal G. Gibson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.