Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Prafford, Tami, Prafford, Trace, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Tollhouse Village Ii Association, Trust-All Roofing, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Fresno with Tharpe, D Tyler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTharpe, D Tyler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2023 |
Category37 Unlimited - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Fresno |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Trace Prafford and Tami Prafford against Trust-All Roofing, Inc. and Tollhouse Village II Association. The plaintiffs allege that the defendants have violated the Davis Sterling Act, the California Rosenthal Fa...
Request to Enter Default
Date: December 14, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Document filed
Date: October 06, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: February 27, 2024Motion filed
Date: December 14, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 14, 2023Return Letter
Date: March 26, 2024Document filed
Date: October 06, 2023Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 17, 2024Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 27, 2024Notice Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Request to Enter Default Denied
Date: December 18, 2023Document filed
Date: March 19, 2024Summons issued and filed
Date: October 18, 2023Civil case cover sheet
Date: October 06, 2023Document filed
Date: October 06, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 25, 2023Document filed
Date: October 06, 2023Civil Complaint filed
Date: October 06, 2023Transfer received and filed
Date: March 26, 2024Notice of Hearing
Date: March 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brickey, Daniel |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
03/26/24 Return Letter Return Letter Re: Missing Document from Transfer |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
03/26/24 Notice of Receipt of Papers and Pleadings Filed Notice Filed Notice of Receipt of Papers and Pleadings |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
03/26/24 Transfer received and filed Transfer received and filed All documents transferred from Los Angeles County filed. |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
CV-48A Notice of Case Mgmnt Conf and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes w/Clerk Cert of Mailing Notice of Hearing Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes (Mailed) |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
03/26/24 Notice of Outgoing Transfer Filed Notice Filed Notice of Outgoing Transfer |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
03/19/24 Clerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Records Document filed Document: Clerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Records |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
02/27/24 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Clerk's Certificate of Mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Los Angeles, California on 2/27/24 . Parties served: Jason M. Ingber (Plaintiffs' Attorney) |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
02/27/24 Minute Order Attachment (Ninc Pro Tunc Order) Minute Order Attachment Nunc Pro Tunc Order |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
01/17/24 Minute Order Attachment (Motion to Transfer Granted) Minute Order Attachment Hearing on Motion to Transfer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.