Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Wicomico County. This case was filed in Wicomico County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryContract - Breach |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWicomico County, MD |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Closed | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Opinion and Order of the Court | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Response/Reply | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Sheet | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Response/Reply | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.