Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts Montgomery Circuit Court with Robert A. Greenberg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2021 |
CategoryDiscrimination |
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, MD |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseMontgomery Circuit Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference - Pre-Trial
Judge: McAuliffe, Michael |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Motion
Judge: Lease, David |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion/Request | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request/Petition - Denied
Judge: Bonifant, James A |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.