Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County. This case was filed in Montgomery County Superior Courts Montgomery Circuit Court with Schweitzer, Margaret Marie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2021 |
CategoryAppeal - Administrative Agency |
Last RefreshedJune 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, MD |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Filing Court HouseMontgomery Circuit Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Record Appeal
Judge: Schweitzer, Margaret Marie |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Takes Under Advisement
Judge: Schweitzer, Margaret Marie |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Sheet
Judge: Schweitzer, Margaret Marie |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Record Appeal
Judge: Schweitzer, Margaret Marie |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Record Issued | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Compliance | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Administrative Agency Record Received | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript and Record |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.