Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Howard County. This case was filed in Howard County Superior Courts with Coleman, Quincy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2023 |
CategoryTort - Malpractice Medical |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHoward County, MD |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Closed | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Stipulation | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate Regarding Discovery | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion/Request/Notice - Strike/Withdraw and Enter Appearance | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Supporting Document | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Line | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Line | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference/Pretrial Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.