Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Thurman, Vaughn, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Burgoon, Stephen Samuel, against Usaa General Indemnity Company, in the jurisdiction of Baltimore County. This case was filed in Baltimore County Superior Courts Baltimore County with Hanley, Paul Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Insurance |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBaltimore County, MD |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Filing Court HouseBaltimore County |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Stipulation | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice/Designation - Expert Witness(es) | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency - Rule 20-203(d) | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Deficient Filing | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Discovery | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation / List Witness(es) | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Discovery | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.