Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chojnacki, Megan, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Browne, Justin Anthony, against Koons Chevrolet, Inc, represented by Charner, Yedidyah, Seegull, Larry Robert, in the jurisdiction of Baltimore County. This case was filed in Baltimore County Superior Courts Baltimore County Circuit Court with Paul J. Hanley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2021 |
CategoryTort - Negligence |
Last RefreshedJune 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBaltimore County, MD |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseBaltimore County Circuit Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Stipulation | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal - Stipulation Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request Moot
Judge: Fader, John F, II |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request Moot order marking def's motion to stay discovery moot |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request Moot order marking def's motion for sj moot |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request Granted
Judge: Hanley, Paul Joseph |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request Granted Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment extended until February 4, 2022 |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request Granted
Judge: Hanley, Paul Joseph |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Motion/Request Granted order granting plt's motion for extension of time to respond to def's motion to stay |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Consent Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.