Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Chin, Michelle, Lai, Emily Mei, Lai, Peter, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Cheng, Doris, against Does One Through Fifty, Heining, Travis, Maayah, Susan, Mills Peninsula Emergency Medical Associates, Inc., Mills-Peninsula Hospital Foundation, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Healy, Nicole S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2024 |
Category(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves defendants Does 1 through 50, business organizations providing health care services in San Mateo County, California. Defendant SUTTER HEALTH operated Mills-Peninsula Medical Center, and defendant MILLS-PENINSULA HOSPITAL FOUND...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 17, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 15, 2024Complaint
Date: April 15, 2024Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 24, 202496046Compl00a2cc
Date: April 16, 202496046Summo029572
Date: April 16, 202496046Civil01283e
Date: April 16, 202496104APPLI0040a4
Date: April 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
September 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO Deot 28m IRDER AOOIUBTUBG GYARDUAB AD KUTEN Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Signed by Judge Healy on 04/23/2024 |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Application FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96359Appli006541 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96359Order016f99 | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 96046Compl00a2cc | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 96046Summo029572 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.