Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Ferreira Freire , Joao, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Romano, Mark P., against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2024 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Plaintiff JOAO FERREIRA FREIRE against Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY and DOES 1 through 10. The complaint alleges a breach of warranty of a 2020 Ford Ranger vehicle, VIN: 1FTER4FH4LLA99733, in the City of Colma,...
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 16, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 15, 2024Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 19, 2024Complaint
Date: April 15, 2024Ferreira.Summons
Date: April 15, 2024Ferreira.Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 15, 2024Ferreira.Complaint docs
Date: April 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
September 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) to COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) to COMPLAINT |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | 96360Answe001798 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.