Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
De Bautista, Mayra Elizabeth Ramos, Lopez, Elva Vaneza Bautista, Lopez, Emilce Arelis Bautista, Lopez, Henry Nehemias Bautista, Madero, Hellen Alejandra Santiago, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Alexandra, Jessica Y., against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Jujare, Madhusudhan R., Mohindra, Amit, Samp Investments, Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2024 |
Category(33) Unlimited Wrongful Eviction |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal case filed by multiple plaintiffs against defendants regarding the rental property located at 498 Citrus Avenue, Daly City, California. The plaintiffs allege various causes of action, including breach of warranty of habitabi...
Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 23, 202496564SUMMO0013ea
Date: April 23, 202496519Amend00895c
Date: April 23, 2024Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Date: April 10, 2024Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 11, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 10, 2024Application
Date: April 08, 2024Complaint
Date: April 08, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 08, 2024Application
Date: April 08, 2024Application
Date: April 08, 2024Application
Date: April 08, 2024Application
Date: April 08, 2024First Amended Complaint
Date: April 22, 202495518COMPL00c85b
Date: April 08, 202495518Civil013f33
Date: April 08, 202495518APPLI02ac94
Date: April 08, 202495518APPLI038e4f
Date: April 08, 202495518APPLI055a2b
Date: April 08, 202495518APPLI043ca8
Date: April 08, 202495518APPLI068657
Date: April 08, 202495518ORDER077585
Date: April 08, 202495518ORDER08fa2c
Date: April 08, 202495518ORDER09e2d9
Date: April 08, 202495518ORDER100f79
Date: April 08, 202495518ORDER1122fe
Date: April 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
September 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed on FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Summons Issued / Filed on FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 96564SUMMO0013ea | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 96519Amend00895c | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | First Amended Complaint | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM For Minor Karen Dayana Culajay Bautista Application FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM For Minor Karen Dayana Culajay Bautista |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.