Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Loo, Fred, Loo, Mildred, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rose, Valerie N, against Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does One Through One Hundred, represented by Collier, Sharon C., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Healy, Nicole S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2024 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves a legal case where the defendants, including Costco Wholesale Corporation and others, are accused of negligence that led to injuries sustained by Plaintiff Mildred Loo. The incident occurred at a Costco Wholesale store in Redw...
97299ANSWE00df93
Date: May 03, 2024Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 24, 2024Declaration in Support
Date: April 16, 2024Notice of Motion and Motion for Trial Preference
Date: April 16, 2024Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 16, 202496644ANSWE003795
Date: April 24, 2024Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court
Date: April 24, 2024Proposed Order Received
Date: April 16, 2024Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 11, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 10, 2024Summons Issued / Filed
Date: April 09, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 09, 2024Complaint
Date: April 09, 202496689Notic00cfd8
Date: April 25, 202496130PROPO037c4e
Date: April 17, 202496130DECLA021076
Date: April 17, 202496130MEMOR017e7d
Date: April 17, 202496130NOTIC00fa04
Date: April 17, 2024SF198937.POS
Date: April 11, 20242 SF198305_CCCS
Date: April 09, 20243 SF198305_SUMMONS
Date: April 09, 20241 SF198305_COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
September 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
May 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Preferences
Judge: Healy, Nicole S. |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | 97299ANSWE00df93 | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 96689Notic00cfd8 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) to COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) to COMPLAINT |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96644ANSWE003795 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court TEXT NOTICE OF STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court TEXT NOTICE OF STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 96130PROPO037c4e | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 96130DECLA021076 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.