Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Smith, Robert Samuel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Haulk, Matthew A, against Does 1 To 50, Verkada Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2024 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint involves Mr. Smith, who was hired by Verkada as an associate account executive in August 2023. Despite being classified as an "exempt" employee, Mr. Smith did not meet the requirements of any applicable exemption. He regularly worked o...
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 28, 2024Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 28, 2024Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 22, 2024Complaint
Date: March 28, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 29, 202496515Proof00fe93
Date: April 23, 202494889Summo02b452
Date: March 28, 202494889Civil016639
Date: March 28, 202494889Compl005a3b
Date: March 28, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 96515Proof00fe93 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, C ADR PACKET NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, C ADR PACKET NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | 94889Summo02b452 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.